THE FAMILY CENTRE (DEAF CHILDREN)

Charity number: 1062339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stuart Millar Trustee 10 November 2018 None on record
Sonia Brewer Trustee 11 November 2017 None on record
Emma Stevenson Trustee 03 December 2013 None on record
Laura Hunter Trustee 11 November 2017 None on record
NEIL RODERICK CURRY Trustee 20 November 2016 None on record
WILSON MCKELVIE Trustee 22 November 2015 None on record
LAURA JANE ORNA Trustee 20 November 2016 None on record