Financial history THE WYE AND USK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1080319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.05m £1.35m £1.34m £1.46m £1.76m
Total expenditure £1.21m £1.23m £1.22m £1.37m £1.66m
Income from government contracts £5.63k £114.50k £130.71k £221.11k £242.55k
Income from government grants £354.16k £290.45k £622.18k £713.56k £449.99k
Income - Donations and legacies £166.83k £136.24k £129.73k £169.40k £262.42k
Income - Other trading activities £315 £210 £1.49k £393 £393
Income - Charitable activities £870.69k £1.21m £1.21m £1.29m £1.52m
Income - Endowments £21.51k £20.10k £15.97k £18.80k £22.58k
Income - Investment £3.71k £3.81k £4.80k £3.95k £4.67k
Income - Other £4.43k £374 £779 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.20m £1.22m £1.35m £1.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £198 £1.86k £1.83k £23.11k £42.14k
Expenditure - Governance £10.65k £10.50k £11.86k £7.00k £7.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £117.97k £139.82k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £1.40k £1.51k £1.88k
Expenditure - Other £56.89k £28.61k £0 £0 £0