Trustees ROCHESTER EAST AND WEST DISTRICTS OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 303429

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Elizabeth Hunter | Chair | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Louise Crowdey | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice May Day | Trustee | 14 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Elaine Sargeant | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE Rosalie BROOKS | Trustee | 12 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ADRIENNE Lynda SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Julie Ann Elizabeth Perry | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.