1ST SEVENOAKS SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local Scout Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 10 November 1965: Standard registration
- 1ST SEVENOAKS BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Geoffrey Roberts | Chair | 16 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Edward Brunning | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin McDonnell | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Naylor | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolin Hollingsworth | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Fisher | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Baker | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Tyrrell-Clark | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALISON MILLER | Trustee | 01 January 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.56k | £23.79k | £24.54k | £19.98k | £18.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.46k | £12.00k | £18.05k | £20.82k | £21.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.05k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 20TH MARCH 1965 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955.
Charitable objects
1ST SEVENOAKS BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
SEVENOAKS
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 Bradbourne Road
Sevenoaks
TN13 3QE
- Phone:
- 01732462262
- Email:
- 1stsevenoaks@google.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window