SHEPPEY DIVISION GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a programme of leisure time activities with an educational purpose for Guide Association members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 08 November 1962: Standard registration
- SHEPPEY DIVISION GIRL GUIDE HEAD QUARTERS (Previous name)
- SHEPPEY DIVISION GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- SHEPPEY LOCAL ASSOCIATION OF GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Steven Bean | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Thompson | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tina Marie Bean | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Woodward | Trustee | 18 April 2014 |
|
|||||
MOIRA BAGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAYE WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ELLIE BROADBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £999 | £12.20k | £1.23k | £3.83k | £1.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07k | £7.51k | £2.96k | £2.36k | £2.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2023 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 February 2022 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 2ND AUGUST 1958
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE SHEPPEY LOCAL ASSOCIATION OF GIRL GUIDES
Area of benefit
ISLE OF SHEPPEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Wain Court
Minster On Sea
SHEERNESS
Kent
ME12 3NT
- Phone:
- 01795583148
- Email:
- sheppeygghq@gmail.com
- Website:
-
girlguidingsheppey.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window