Accounts and annual returns 5TH SHEPPEY (EASTCHURCH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 669 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required