Financial history 10TH FINCHLEY (SCOTTISH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £47.66k £37.57k £44.82k £33.74k £19.13k
Total expenditure £30.74k £30.73k £42.30k £18.15k £13.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A