Trustees SOUTH DOWNE MUSICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1068737
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN JENKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Powney | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Garnett | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Perry Joseph Ralls | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Hall | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emily Horner | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Brown | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Oliver Gibbins | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Shirlaw | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANITA WATERHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES GENNINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AUDREY PRING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.