Accounts and annual returns KESKERDH KERNOW LIMITED

Charity number: 1062022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 April 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 04 June 2019 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required