Financial history OLDFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1061683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.56k £7.93k £8.13k £8.37k £8.54k
Total expenditure £7.79k £7.63k £5.74k £5.64k £1.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A