PHILIP NICHOLAS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities are to support maritime studies, particularly, at Hull University. And to also support other charitable purposes connected with the sea
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John McCarthy | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Butler | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sam Willis | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.33k | £39.07k | £46.69k | £46.15k | £41.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.27k | £72.72k | £67.94k | £97.37k | £117.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 OCTOBER 1996 AND AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 18 MARCH 2004. AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06 JUN 2017 as amended on 14 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP INTEREST AND KNOWLEDGE IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO MARITIME AND UNDERWATER CULTURAL HERITAGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Heron Gate Office Park
Hankridgeway
Taunton
Somerset
TA1 2LR
- Phone:
- 0140443431
- Email:
- law@everys.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window