Financial history ASDAN

Charity number: 1066927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.03m £2.97m £2.66m £1.78m £2.95m
Total expenditure £3.00m £3.01m £3.08m £1.69m £3.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.97m £2.91m £2.60m £1.73m £2.89m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £55.97k £62.67k £65.58k £36.63k £59.03k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £7.30k £3.85k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.00m £2.98m £3.05m £1.67m £3.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £28.58k £27.20k £16.18k £0
Expenditure - Governance £42.38k £47.56k £74.10k £11.11k £8.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £511 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £28.58k £27.20k £16.18k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0