VALE OF RHEIDOL RAILWAY LIMITED

Charity number: 1076037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 June 2021 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 June 2021 221 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time Download