VALE OF RHEIDOL RAILWAY LIMITED

Charity number: 1076037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.16m £1.50m £1.40m £1.64m £348.13k
Total expenditure £834.27k £1.20m £1.20m £1.43m £487.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £61.61k £134.15k £9.28k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £595.40k £710.57k £581.31k £838.83k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £204.80k £196.90k £119.50k £241.24k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £490.67k £595.17k £695.31k £564.90k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.99k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £71.31k £283.35k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £970.32k £1.20m £1.05m £1.09m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £511 £0 £152.32k £339.68k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £247.85k £258.70k £313.06k £277.00k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £511 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A