ANIMALS IN MIND

Charity number: 1063919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £28.62k £27.50k £14.31k £20.24k £12.56k
Total expenditure £28.20k £15.54k £21.30k £12.02k £7.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A