Accounts and annual returns WEST HARPTREE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1061222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 04 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 10 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required