Financial history WEST HARPTREE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1061222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £10.33k £10.49k £20.07k £10.98k £26.02k
Total expenditure £5.81k £9.05k £16.25k £19.28k £27.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £723 £1.46k £10.00k N/A N/A