Financial history CORNWALL MEDIA RESOURCE LIMITED

Charity number: 1061632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £401 £3.55k £2.92k £22.01k £13.92k
Total expenditure £1.54k £3.32k £2.52k £5.43k £7.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £19.84k £10.67k