Financial history FAMILY LINKS (EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES)

Charity number: 1062514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.28m £1.28m £1.26m £914.56k £917.44k
Total expenditure £1.64m £1.14m £1.02m £949.22k £903.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £10.02k N/A N/A £189.91k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £19.27k
Income - Donations and legacies £227.47k £379.86k £116.70k £85.54k £188.03k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.05m £896.73k £1.14m £824.56k £726.94k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.63k £852 £2.46k £3.86k £2.47k
Income - Other £0 £250 £0 £600 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.58m £1.10m £973.16k £900.18k £856.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds £64.18k £44.97k £50.58k £49.03k £46.74k
Expenditure - Governance £5.41k £6.33k £6.17k £5.97k £6.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0