Trustees FAMILY LINKS (EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES)

Charity number: 1062514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Hilary Frances Emery CBE Chair 06 June 2019
None on record
Masood Hassan Trustee 16 March 2021
None on record
Emma Margaret Judge Trustee 10 December 2020
THE WELLINGTON COLLEGE
Received: On time
Gordon Douglas Beach Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Wendy Elizabeth Rose OBE Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
Martin John Havelock Trustee 14 March 2019
None on record
VANESSA IRIS EMMETT Trustee 21 June 2012
None on record
ROSALIND JEANNETTE PORTMAN Trustee
None on record