Financial history 24TH EDMONTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £26.04k £32.60k £32.45k £26.11k £49.79k
Total expenditure £17.27k £37.95k £32.21k £20.68k £29.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £30.00k