Accounts and annual returns 3RD SOUTHGATE (ST PAUL'S WINCHMORE HILL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303655
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 03 September 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 03 September 2020 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 27 October 2019 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 27 October 2019 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 19 September 2018 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 19 September 2018 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2016 03 October 2017 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 03 October 2017 33 days late Download Open in new window