Financial history 4TH HARROW (COUNTY SCHOOL) BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £21.12k £28.78k £28.61k £31.61k £31.83k
Total expenditure £20.00k £26.05k £21.13k £32.12k £16.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £8.10k