Financial history 8TH HORNCHURCH(ST ANDREW'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £69.76k £82.14k £76.07k £36.83k £96.63k
Total expenditure £64.40k £65.61k £79.89k £34.94k £78.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £20.24k £8.00k