19TH WIMBLEDON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £102.28k £85.80k £81.36k £80.89k £90.53k
Total expenditure £86.44k £66.26k £60.77k £46.81k £61.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A