Accounts and annual returns BARKING AND DAGENHAM DISTRICT SCOUTS

Charity number: 303798
Charity reporting is overdue by 1119 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2023 364 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 April 2021 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1119 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required