Financial history ILFORD NORTHWEST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 303807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £22.26k £14.14k £7.27k £6.43k £4.75k
Total expenditure £18.66k £6.83k £9.80k £2.85k £4.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A