Trustees 13TH TWICKENHAM (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303823
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maggie Elizabeth Vivian Chair 12 June 2015
None on record
Joanne Coles Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record
Fiona Cain Trustee 24 June 2016
None on record
Martin Wood Trustee 26 February 2014
None on record
JANICE ANNE KERSHAW Trustee 02 August 2011
None on record
SARAH LOUISE KERSHAW Trustee
RICHMOND UPON THAMES DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
NICHOLAS PETER WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
DAVID JOURDAIN KERSHAW Trustee
None on record