Accounts and annual returns 8TH WANDSWORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 July 2022 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 July 2020 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 May 2019 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 May 2018 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required