1ST ST MARYLEBONE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303880
Charity reporting is overdue by 597 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 597 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 597 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required