1ST ST MARYLEBONE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303880
Charity reporting is overdue by 604 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £2.45k £4.85k £5.32k £2.91k £3.19k
Total expenditure £3.64k £1.00k £4.03k £2.28k £2.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A