Trustees GREATER LONDON MIDDLESEX WEST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 303887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHAD LAKE Chair
None on record
Christopher John Nicholas Trustee 24 September 2023
None on record
Paul Kenneth Catchpole Trustee 24 September 2023
None on record
Alkesh Shah Trustee 25 September 2022
BARKING AND DAGENHAM DISTRICT SCOUTS
Overdue by 1207 days
HARROW DISTRICT SCOUTS
Received: On time
Claire Katie Shannon Muxlow Trustee 25 September 2022
FIRST GREENFORD SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
David William Kitchen Trustee 19 September 2021
BRENT DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Dr ALEXANDER PHILIP NORORI-MCCORMAC Trustee 19 September 2021
None on record
RISHI-NAYAN VARODARIA Trustee 17 January 2021
None on record
Catherine Stephenie Joyce Muxlow Trustee 17 January 2021
3RD WEMBLEY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
FIRST GREENFORD SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Susan Margaret Chick Trustee 22 September 2019
None on record
ZACHARY JAMES SEDDON DEANE Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
Paul Richard Dickson Trustee 23 September 2018
1ST OSTERLEY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
David James Browning Trustee 02 October 2016
UXBRIDGE AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
PHIL POWER Trustee 02 October 2016
None on record
LEON PATRICK MIELEWCZYK Trustee 24 October 2011
20TH CHISWICK SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
THAMESIDE GRAND UNION DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
DAVID CARLEN Trustee
None on record
JOHN ARNOLD Trustee
None on record