Trustees HADDISCOE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 303965

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Arthur Markham | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Warnes | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Ells | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Howell | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Howell | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Smith | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Larinda Smith | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Anthony Francis Lewis | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Victor Moore | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Brett | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dawn Cornwell | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHERYL ANN SOANES | Trustee | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.