Accounts and annual returns INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING

Charity number: 1079573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 February 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window