Trustees THE GREENWICH FOUNDATION FOR THE OLD ROYAL NAVAL COLLEGE

Charity number: 1062519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PRODAMAN KUMAR SARWAL Trustee 01 January 2023
THE CHATHAM HISTORIC DOCKYARD TRUST
Received: On time
Thomas Edward Wipperman Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
ERIC GEORGE REYNOLDS Trustee 03 August 2022
THE GLORIANA TRUST
Received: On time
TRANSGLOBE EXPEDITION TRUST
Received: On time
MOSSBOURNE CHARITABLE TRUST CIO
Recently registered
Duncan Henry Wilson Trustee 03 August 2022
None on record
Nicola Briggs Trustee 21 March 2019
None on record
Diane Laura Whyte Trustee 01 November 2018
None on record
Vice-Admiral Sir Adrian James Johns KCB CBE DL Trustee 01 November 2018
THE FRIENDS OF GIBRALTAR HERITAGE SOCIETY
Received: On time
Desmond Shawe-Taylor LVO Trustee 17 December 2015
THE BURLINGTON MAGAZINE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JAMARIA KONG Trustee 17 December 2015
BEDE HOUSE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Andrew Clark Trustee 17 December 2015
None on record