Financial history ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £5.29m £5.68m £5.93m £7.48m £7.93m
Total expenditure £5.77m £5.82m £6.17m £7.17m £7.82m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £981.00k £1.08m £1.29m £1.19m £1.29m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.86m £4.36m £4.69m £5.84m £6.24m
Income - Endowments £735.00k £844.00k £876.00k £0 £1.29m
Income - Investment £176.00k £224.00k £234.00k £291.00k £306.00k
Income - Other £0 £852.00k £588.00k £165.00k £93.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.61m £5.70m £6.02m £7.02m £7.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £161.00k £113.00k £146.00k £156.00k £94.00k
Expenditure - Governance £16.00k £16.00k £17.00k £18.00k £21.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £36.00k £26.58k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0