THE MUNDESLEY CORONATION HALL

Charity number: 304014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required