Financial history THE MUNDESLEY CORONATION HALL

Charity number: 304014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £45.60k £41.67k £23.75k £22.43k £52.20k
Total expenditure £37.35k £25.72k £43.67k £23.89k £42.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £20.60k N/A £18.79k N/A