THE MUNDESLEY CORONATION HALL

Charity number: 304014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maureen Ollivier Trustee 22 March 2017 None on record
PAMELA MALONE Trustee None on record
HELEN HEYWOOD Trustee 22 March 2017 None on record
PAUL REYNOLDS Trustee None on record
Valerie Fortnam Trustee 23 March 2016 None on record
Steve Tarry Trustee 17 March 2015 None on record
Sue Simms Trustee 07 April 2015 None on record
FREDERICK WALTERS Trustee None on record
Dr Rod Beavon Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
Dawn Smith Trustee 23 March 2016 None on record
Peter Molyneux Chair 23 March 2016 None on record
Carol Howard Trustee 23 March 2016 None on record