THE NORFOLK COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 304155
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

21 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

19 January 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)