BARTON SEAGRAVE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.56k £17.57k £3.70k £9.28k £1.20k
Total expenditure £19.96k £15.52k £3.25k £6.75k £3.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A