BARFORD ST JOHN AND ST MICHAEL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required