BARFORD ST JOHN AND ST MICHAEL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.76k £9.12k £7.92k £8.19k £3.27k
Total expenditure £4.25k £13.12k £8.09k £14.45k £13.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A