RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 304297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.99k £2.73k £2.55k £2.55k £3.12k
Total expenditure £3.58k £3.02k £1.95k £3.19k £5.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A