Accounts and annual returns 1ST MOULTON GIRL GUIDES COMPANY

Charity number: 304408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 December 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 March 2020 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required