Accounts and annual returns BUCKLAND ST MARY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 November 2020 284 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 November 2020 649 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2019 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required