BURNHAM AREA YOUTH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of children and young people upto the age of 25, including adults with learning and physical difficulties and the provision of facilities for them. To promote for the benefit of the residents of Burnham-on Sea and Highbridge and the surrounding area the provision of facilities for recreation and other leasure time occupation of individuals who have need of such.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 20 December 2005: Standard registration
- BAY CENTRE (Working name)
- BAY CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE LANG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jan Newton | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Lilley | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN RUFUS | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|||||
John Colquhoun | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALEXANDER | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET BONUS | Trustee | 10 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES FRAPE | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
JULIA ANNE ELSWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.75k | £26.78k | £30.87k | £16.88k | £15.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.78k | £14.04k | £33.00k | £18.60k | £22.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £13.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF 24 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN & YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25, INCLUDING ADULTS WITH LEARNING & PHYSICAL DIFFICULTIES, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THEM ETC.(SEE CONSTITUTION FOR FULL OBJECTS) 2. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BURNHAM & THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION & OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH BY REASON OF AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BURNHAM-ON-SEA
Linked charities
- 20 December 2005 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURNHAM AREA YOUTH CLUB
CASSIS CLOSE
BURNHAM-ON-SEA
TA8 1NN
- Phone:
- 07835 143187
- Email:
- baybookings@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window