Trustees CLAPTON AND WAYFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FRANK NIGEL TREVILLIAN FREEMAN Chair 28 October 2015
None on record
Oliver Pyle-Santini Trustee 17 January 2022
None on record
Barbara Mary Woodward Trustee 25 October 2018
None on record
MICK WILSON Trustee 27 October 2016
None on record
ADRIENNE SHEILA PYKE Trustee 01 November 2014
None on record
CHARLES SWAFFIELD Trustee
FIRST CREWKERNE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
RICHARD JOHN JEFFREY Trustee
None on record
REGINALD MUSSETT Trustee
None on record
MARY WILSON Trustee
None on record
Julia Borland Trustee
None on record