CLEVEDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £77.47k £84.10k £87.96k £99.56k £124.98k
Total expenditure £76.02k £88.16k £89.47k £100.20k £111.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.50k £3.00k £3.00k