Trustees EVERCREECH VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR NIC JEFFERIS | Chair | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Patricia Steward | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY SPENCER JESSOP | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA WILCOX | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE LOUISE ASHFORD | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW RICHARD CHURCH | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN PHYLLIS LINDSAY | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ASHWORTH | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN CHARLES HOLE | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
GAIL WAKEFORD | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR RICHARD KEWISH | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARION JOYCE COVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA JOYCE PILBEAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET CATRIONA RUNDLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.